REACH THE CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Filtered springs for rural schools and villages in Uganda and Kenya. Funding construction of latrines for schools in Uganda and Kenya. Working with disability groups providing medical equipment to Uganda School for the Deaf. Supported Grandmas pineapple model gardens planting 15,000 suckers generating sustainable income for impoverished families in the rural environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Kenya
- Uganda
Governance
- 14 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RAYMOND BOTTERELL | Chair | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Mace | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tarig El Sheikh | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tony Jordan | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
KATHRYN GIBSON | Trustee | 13 June 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.11k | £33.99k | £94.13k | £80.10k | £84.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.13k | £39.24k | £59.09k | £109.25k | £91.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO RELIEVE POVERTY OF CHILDREN LIVING IN AFRICA WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Manor Gardens
Westoning
Bedford
MK45 5NA
- Phone:
- 01525717697
- Email:
- info@reachthechildren.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window