Financial history THE CHURCH OF CHRIST IN MISSION CCM

Charity number: 1106982
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £71.05k £77.88k £76.65k £69.55k £61.29k
Total expenditure £68.87k £68.92k £63.26k £65.81k £69.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A