HEAVEN & EARTH (THEATRE COMPANY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heaven and Earth Theatre Company leads workshops on Shakespeare's plays in schools and with home educated young people. It is developing a programme of after-school clubs for primary schools which explore Shakespeare. In the future it intends to put on productions of Shakespeare's plays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 30 November 2004: Standard registration
- 16 June 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | 31/08/2014 | 31/08/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £700 | £0 | £67 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | 23 May 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | 28 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 08 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO, PERSONS WHO LIVE OR WORK IN THE GEOGRAPHICAL AREAS OF BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND HERTFORDSHIRE IN ARTS AND CRAFTS, INCLUDING, BUT NOT LIMITED TO, DRAMA, BALLET, MIME, DANCE, MUSIC, SINGING, OPERA, LITERATURE, PAINTING, DRAWING, SCULPTURE, CERAMICS, FILM MAKING AND PHOTOGRAPHY, IN VENUES INCLUDING, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY LIMITED TO SPRING MEADOW FARM, NR. BERKHAMSTEAD, HERTFORDSHIRE.
Area of benefit
BUCKINGHAMSHIRE AND HERTFORDSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window