THE PRITCHARD FOUNDATION, LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide non-institutional assistance to orphaned and abandoned children, particularly those abandoned with AIDS in Romania and eastern europe. Extend charities activities to assist orphans and abandoned children in Asia by providing grants, sponsorship and management and support for family model non-institutional care home
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bangladesh
- India
- Nepal
- Romania
- Ukraine
Governance
- 03 March 2005: Standard registration
- TPF (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PRITCHARD | Chair | 12 March 2005 |
|
|
||||
Tim Eady | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
DITA ULVROVA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.60k | £21.30k | £12.97k | £4.85k | £2.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.88k | £10.72k | £6.79k | £1.81k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 FEBRUARY 2005 as amended on 28 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO ESTABLISH ALTERNATIVES TO INSTITUTIONAL RESIDENTIAL CARE FOR ORPHAN AND ABANDONED CHILDREN IN ROMANIA AND OTHER DEVELOPING COUNTRIES. 2. TO PROVIDE GRANTS AND SPONSORSHIP TO PROJECTS IN UNDEVELOPED COUNTRIES WHICH ARE WORKING TOWARDS BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD RESIDENTIAL CARE AND THE AMELIORATION OF INSTITUTIONALISATION
Area of benefit
ROMANIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 The Enterdent
Godstone
Godstone
RH9 8EG
- Phone:
- 0000000000
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window