Financial history LIVINGSTONES CHRISTIAN CENTRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1112325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £73.19k £53.82k £47.57k £46.02k £34.05k
Total expenditure £89.37k £61.57k £46.40k £50.46k £32.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £13.96k £11.25k £11.25k N/A