CARING FOR EX OFFENDERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The vision of CFEO is to reduce the re-offending rate in the UK and internationally by reintegrating ex-offenders into society through the local church. CFEO believes that by breaking the cycle of crime, individuals, families and neighbourhoods can be transformed. The main focus of the work is linking ex-offenders upon release with a supportive church community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 November 2004: Standard registration
- 18 May 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 03 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 10 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 04 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
3.1) PROVIDING ADVICE EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND RELIEVING POVERTY AND SICKNESS AMONGST PERSONS WHO ARE PRESENTLY DETAINED, HAVE PREVIOUSLY BEEN DETAINED OR ARE AT RISK OF BEING DETAINED IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AND AMONGST THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS BY SUCH MEANS AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. 3.2) ASSISTING PERSONS WHO ARE PRESENTLY DETAINED, OR HAVE BEEN DETAINED IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF BEING DETAINED WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD TO FIND ACCOMMODATION FOR THEMSELVES AND THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS AND TO FIND EMPLOYMENT AND TO PROVIDE ACCOMMODATION AND EMPLOYMENT FOR SUCH PERSONS; 3.3) DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING PROGRAMMES INTENDED TO CHANGE THE BEHAVIOUR AND ATTITUDES OF PERSONS WHO ARE PRESENTLY DETAINED OR WHO HAVE BEEN DETAINED AND THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF BEING DETAINED IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OF ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD, WITH THE AIM OF FACILITATING THEIR REHABILITATION INTO SOCIETY; 3.4) TRAINING VOLUNTEERS TO PROVIDE ADVICE ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT TO PERSONS 2WHO ARE PRESENTLY DETAINED OR WHO HAVE BEEN DETAINED IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OF BEING DETAINED WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD AND TO DELIVER THE PROGRAMMES DEVELOPED UNDER 3.3 ABOVE; AND 3.5 TO ADVANCE BIBLICAL PRINCIPLES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF APPROPRIATE TEACHING TO PERSONS WHO ARE PRESENTLY DETAINED OR HAVE BEEN DETAINED IN ANY PENAL OR CORRECTIONAL ESTABLISHMENT AND TO THOSE WHO ARE AT RISK OR BEING DETAINED, THEIR FAMILIES AND DEPENDANTS WHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window