SUSSEX PONY GRAZING AND CONSERVATION TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust uses Exmoor ponies to provide a grazing service to landowners and farmers of wildlife-rich land that requires grazing of coarse, or nutrient-poor vegetation - areas often of SSSI status. Originally begun to conserve flower-rich pastures on the South Downs, the Trust is also now heavily involved with grazing of areas of lowland heathland on Ashdown Forest, Eridge and Chailey Common.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Kent
- West Sussex
Governance
- 14 February 2005: Standard registration
- 02 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.47k | £45.84k | £55.78k | £62.47k | £54.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.34k | £42.67k | £47.78k | £59.54k | £55.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £9.90k | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16/08/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/02/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/04/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/04/2014
Charitable objects
THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES, FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF WILDLIFE BIODIVERSITY AND FOR PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES AND AIMS IF AND SO FAR AS THE SAME ARE CHARITABLE, THAT IS TO SAY: 1) TO PROMOTE AND UNDERTAKE THE CONSERVATION OF THE NATIVE FLORA, FAUNA AND LANDSCAPE BY PROMOTING BIOLOGICAL DIVERSITY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY GRAZING WITH WILD PONIES ON GRASSLAND OR HEATHLAND TYPE HABITATS OF ECOLOGICAL OR OTHER SCIENTIFIC IMPORTANCE: AND 2) TO PROMOTE, UNDERTAKE OR SPONSOR SCIENTIFIC STUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE HABITATS, REQUIREMENTS AND LIFE CYCLES OF FLORA AND FAUNA IN RELATION TO CONSERVATION MANAGEMENT, AGRICULTURAL PRACTICES AND HUMAN ACTIVITIES AND TO DISSEMINATE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE EAST SUSSEX
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window