BRIERFIELD ACTION IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The company is for the public benefit within Brierfield and surrounding areas - to support and improve opportunities for education, health and the environment - to improve community cohesion, tackle social exclusion, promote public safety, prevent crime and improve the quality of social, economic, cultural and physical life - to facilitate other agencies and individuals in pursuing the above.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
Total income includes £2,667 from 1 government contract(s) and £2,667 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Lancashire
Governance
- 02 December 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Michael Piers Sagar | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Firminger | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL TENNANT | Trustee | 21 June 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £120.56k | £110.11k | £51.35k | £50.96k | £115.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.74k | £131.38k | £77.22k | £48.55k | £43.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.67k | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.95k | N/A | N/A | £21.81k | £2.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 284 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2022
(These accounts |
08 November 2023 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 10 October 2022 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 24 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 21 NOVEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED 28 NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED ON 3 JUNE 2008.
Charitable objects
3 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE LIVING WITHIN THE AREA OF BURNLEY AND PENDLE (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES:- 3.1 TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF URBAN AND/OR RURAL REGENERATION IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHERE THERE IS SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING; 3.1.2 THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH; 3.1.2 THE PROMOTION OF EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON GROUNDS OF RACE, RELIGION, DISABILITY OR ETHNIC ORIGIN BY RAISING AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE BACKGROUND, QUALITIES AND NEEDS OF INDIVIDUALS LIVING IN AND ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS OPERATING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND BY PROMOTING ATTITUDES, CUSTOMS AND PRACTICES IN FAVOUR OF EQUALITY; 3.1.3 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES AVAILABLE FOR USE BY THE COMMUNITY OR ANY SECTION OF IT; 3.1.4 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; 3.1.5 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 3.1.6 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME; 3.2 TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHERE THERE IS SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NEEDS AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY; AND 3.3 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS ARE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
BURNLEY AND PENDLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Brierfield Action in the Community
1-3 Colne Road
Brierfield
NELSON
BB9 5HW
- Phone:
- 07867975665
- Email:
- naheed@baicom.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window