DEREHAM WINDMILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To run a Grade 2 Listed 1835 tower windmill as an educational and leisure centre for the whole community. Also to provide a coffee shop/community centre in the grounds of the windmill for multi general community use/benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 11 March 2005: Standard registration
- DEREHAM WINDMILL (Working name)
- THE FRIENDS OF DEREHAM WINDMILL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Heather Melandri-Street | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Alan French | Trustee | 19 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Mary Whittington | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Holt | Trustee | 21 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Helen Monument | Trustee | 16 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hugh King | Trustee | 11 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Joan Hayter | Trustee | 08 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Drew | Trustee | 29 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.62k | £23.53k | £11.05k | £13.37k | £12.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.69k | £6.19k | £6.95k | £36.92k | £7.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.70k | £16.35k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/02/2005 AS AMENDED ON 11/01/2013 AS AMENDED ON 27/08/2013 as amended on 29 May 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION AND MAINTENANCE OF DEREHAM WINDMILL FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY AND THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION AND LEISURE ACTIVITIES OF THE LAND ATTACHED TO DEREHAM WINDMILL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
86 Norwich Road
Barnham Broom
Norwich
NR9 4BU
- Phone:
- 07547451990
- Email:
- ruth258@uwclub.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window