CADET SEA RANGER/SEA RANGER SHIP CHURCHILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a uniformed youth group for girls aged 9-21 years. We offer all forms of Nautical Activities, including boating, rowing, canoeing, swimming and occasional sailing in the summer. Badge work, water safety, 1st Aid and knot work etc. in the winter. The girls have lots of fun and adventure on and off the water, learn to work together as a team and make new friends.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
- Torbay
Governance
- 26 November 2004: Standard registration
- BRIXHAM SEA RANGERS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lucy Mary Jones | Trustee | 01 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Susan Elizabeth Maddocks | Trustee |
|
||||||
STEPHANIE LOUISE LUSCOMBE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.37k | £12.46k | £18.99k | £6.78k | £3.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.12k | £3.11k | £3.39k | £3.65k | £5.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | £17.23k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
TO TRAIN GIRLS AND YOUNG WOMEN IN BOATING AND OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES THEREBY ENCOURAGING THEM TO WIDEN THEIR INTERESTS TO ENABLE THEM TO TAKE AN ACTIVE AND RESPONSIBLE ROLE IN SOCIETY. THE CREW SHALL PROMOTE SEA RANGERING AND SHALL OPERATE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE SEA RANGER ASSOCIATION'S RULES AND REGULATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Ocean View Drive
BRIXHAM
Devon
TQ5 0BA
- Phone:
- 01803855182
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window