CAROLINA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity are to advance the education of the students of the University of North Carolina at Chaphel Hill ("the University") and particularly the studnets if its College of Arts and Sciences ("the College")and to promote the scholarly interests of the University and College faculty in England and Wales and elsewhere. The charity is a limited company registered at Companies House.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
Total income:
£999,324
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £41.00k | |
Other trading activities | £18.27k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £940.06k |
Total expenditure:
£1,141,897
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.14m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.14m |
People

3 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RICHARD J C WILMOT-SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER G C MALLINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr JAMES L LELOUDIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCIA V HALPERN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES R M CAMERON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £471.42k | £160.54k | £347.44k | £769.49k | £999.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £433.56k | £160.87k | £310.06k | £816.74k | £1.14m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.02k | £3.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £62.36k | £18.27k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £703.01k | £41.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.12k | £940.06k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £816.74k | £1.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £75.44k | £62.98k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £148.46k | £264.54k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £149.78k | £395.98k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 March 2024 | 28 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 12 April 2023 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2022
(These accounts |
12 April 2023 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2021
(These accounts |
28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 28TH APRIL 2004.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE STUDENTS ("THE STUDENTS") OF THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL AND PARTICULARLY THE STUDENTS OF ITS COLLEGE OF ARTS AND SCIENCES ("THE UNIVERSITY AND THE COLLEGE") AND TO PROMOTE THE SCHOLARLY INTERESTS OF THE UNIVERSITY AND COLLEGE FACULTY ("THE FACULTY") IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND ELSEWHERE BY: 3.1 ASSISTING WITH THE ESTABLISHMENT AND OPERATION OF A LONDON STUDY CENTRE TO SERVE THE STUDENTS, FACULTY ALUMNI AND ACADEMIC UNITS OF THE UNIVERSITY AND IN PARTICULAR THE COLLEGE; 3.2 ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF ACADEMIC COURSES, LECTURES AND PROGRAMS IN THE HISTORY, CULTURE, POLITICS AND SOCIETY OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND EIRE AND OTHER COUNTRIES; 3.3 PROMOTING RELATIONS BETWEEN THE COLLEGE AND UNIVERSITY AND INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION AND FURTHER EDUCATION IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND ELSEWHERE; 3.4 PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF GRANTS OR LOANS TO THE STUDENTS, FACULTY AND ACADEMIC UNITS OF THE COLLEGE AND THE UNIVERSITY; 3.5 PROVIDING SERVICES AND ASSISTANCE TO STUDENTS FROM INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND ELSEWHERE ENROLLING TO THE UNIVERSITY AND IN PARTICULAR THE COLLEGE; AND 3.6 ASSISTING IN THE IMPLEMENTATION OF JOINT PROJECTS RELATED TO THE ACADEMIC MISSION OF THE UNIVERSITY AND THE COLLEGE AND ITS PARTNER INSTITUTIONS OF HIGHER EDUCATION IN ENGLAND AND WALES AND ELSEWHERE INSOFAR AS SUCH PROJECTS ARE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND AND WALES AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA
3 BEDFORD SQUARE
LONDON
WC1B 3RA
- Phone:
- 02076368325
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window