TEESVALLEY WOMENS CENTRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TRAINING & EDUCATION, CHILDCARE, SUPPORT & GUIDANCE FOR WOMEN
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Middlesbrough
- Redcar And Cleveland
- Stockton-on-tees
Governance
- 24 November 2004: Standard registration
- SOUTH BANK WOMEN'S CENTRE (Previous name)
- SOUTH BANK WOMEN'S CENTRE LIMITED (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KALWINDER KAUR | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Keating | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Begg | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Edwina McTierman | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Coates | Trustee | 16 December 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.75k | £245.87k | £306.83k | £271.98k | £339.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.33k | £220.87k | £275.28k | £267.28k | £309.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £87.38k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 NOVEMBER 2008. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
A) TO RELIEVE WOMEN RESIDENTS IN TEES VALLEY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS. B) THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH OF WOMEN RESIDENTS, C) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION
Area of benefit
MIDDLESBROUGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
UPPER ALBION STREET
MIDDLESBROUGH
CLEVELAND
TS6 6XG
- Phone:
- 01642296166
- Email:
- debby.winstanley@tvwc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window