Accounts and annual returns SAFETY NET ADVICE AND SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity number: 1109056
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 24 January 2017 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 16 June 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 16 June 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 October 2013 20 May 2014 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 20 May 2014 On Time