Financial history SAFETY NET ADVICE AND SUPPORT CENTRE

Charity number: 1109056
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2011 31/10/2012 31/10/2013 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £164.49k £219.04k £211.15k £413.24k £343.73k
Total expenditure £151.38k £172.47k £233.78k £309.21k £352.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £55.13k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £112.57k £113.10k