Trustees OVERSTONE COMBINED SCHOOL PTA
Charity number: 1107050

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Natalie Bird | Chair | 23 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Green | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Viktoria Wahl | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Fay | Trustee | 30 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Macphail | Trustee | 25 October 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.