BLACKPOOL CHINESE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1107540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Sunday School promotes Chinese cultures and education for people of all ages. Wu Shu and Tai Chi Classes, Lion/Dragon Dance are held with the intention to advance art, culture and heritage Language Classes: English Cantonese Mandarin. Women's Group Advice and information on health and well being, knowledge of British society and integration Elderly groups regular social meetings

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £1,298
Total expenditure: £1,367

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Blackpool
  • Lancashire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 January 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DANNY HUI Chair
None on record
SIMON LAI Trustee
None on record
PETER LUI Trustee
None on record
WAH SHING WAN Trustee
None on record
TONY LAM Trustee
None on record
JIMSON CHOW Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £13.05k £4.94k £300 £1.30k £1.30k
Total expenditure £14.87k £4.88k £728 £1.37k £1.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 July 2024 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 12 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 11 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
39-41 ST. ANNES ROAD WEST
LYTHAM ST. ANNES
LANCASHIRE
FY8 1SB
Phone:
01253625035
Website:

No information available