Accounts and annual returns Kennet School PTAC

Charity number: 1106961
Charity reporting is up to date (6 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 06 June 2024 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 06 June 2024 6 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 29 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 29 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 30 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 07 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 07 June 2021 372 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 29 September 2021 486 days late Download Open in new window