ACKERS ADVENTURE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of outdoor activities including skiing, tubing, tobogganing, climbing, abseiling, canoeing, kayaking, bell boating, zip wires, fan descender, orienteering, bush craft, disc golf, team building & archery. School holiday club. Self catering 26 bed residential centre for overnight stays. Also manages the site as open space for community use.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 13 December 2004: Standard registration
- ACKERS TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TRACY WASSALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Emma Martin | Trustee | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Marghoob Mohamed | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Bateman | Trustee | 18 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
GEOFF THOMAS | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
IAN LANE | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER STROUD | Trustee | 03 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
EDMUND MOULDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £456.93k | £351.53k | £424.33k | £539.71k | £496.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £510.36k | £374.18k | £418.61k | £524.93k | £521.06k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.50k | £209.61k | £55.21k | £26.50k | £16.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £16.57k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.87k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £508.28k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £521.91k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £3.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £6.12k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WEST MIDLANDS AND ELSEWHERE IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
ACKERS BASE CAMP
GOLDEN HILLOCK ROAD
SPARKBROOK
BIRMINGHAM
B11 2PY
- Phone:
- 01217725111
- Email:
- info@ackers-adventure.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window