Friends of Sun Hill Junior School

Charity Number: 1107087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising activities to support and advance the education of the pupils of Sun Hill Junior School. Development of effective relationships between staff, parents and others associated with the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £3,201
Total expenditure: £9,821

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 December 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • SUN HILL JUNIOR SCHOOL PTA (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Anita Lamont Trustee 14 July 2023
None on record
Stacey Lakeman Trustee 24 September 2020
None on record
Sue Griffith Trustee 01 September 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £5.42k £11.71k £11.97k £8.62k £3.20k
Total expenditure £6.84k £9.03k £10.27k £6.46k £9.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.00k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 06 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 15 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 08 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 17 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Sun Hill Junior School
Sun Lane
Alresford
ALRESFORD
SO24 9NB
Phone:
01962732801
Website:

No information available