Financial history THE MILVERTON CONCERT SOCIETY

Charity number: 1107070
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.53k £6.49k £27.57k £13.23k £13.78k
Total expenditure £9.88k £5.67k £21.53k £12.73k £15.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A