Trustees CONSUMERS INTERNATIONAL
Charity number: 1122155

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip Radford | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anindita Mehta | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Molenaar | Trustee | 26 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Shumireyi Chikarakara Mpofu | Trustee | 12 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rocio Concha | Trustee | 24 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Caceres VALLE CRISOLOGO LUIS | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Fung Han Wong | Trustee | 02 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARIMUTHU NADASON | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.