THE MICHAEL AND BETTY LITTLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
See page 2 of Trustees' Report and Accounts for the year ended 31st March 2010
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- South Africa
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 22 December 2004: Standard registration
- MBL TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katherine Shipton | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Christopher Little | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Martin Little | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Blackgrove | Trustee | 19 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Hilary Graham | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Helen Little | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Moore | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Little | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £751.96k | £197.59k | £103.59k | £658.84k | £38.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.80m | £691.89k | £1.22m | £1.76m | £897.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £623.83k | N/A | N/A | £573.83k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £128.14k | N/A | N/A | £63.39k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £21.61k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | £573.83k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.70m | N/A | N/A | £1.70m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £93.49k | N/A | N/A | £63.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £3.87k | N/A | N/A | £10.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £1.70m | N/A | N/A | £1.69m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £87.69k | N/A | N/A | £63.14k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 265 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 265 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 March 2021 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED 23 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY EXECUTION OF NEW DEED 20 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES MUST APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ('THE OBJECTS'): TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: (I) RELIEVING THOSE IN FINANCIAL NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS; (II) RELIEVING THE SICK AND PROTECTING AND PRESERVING PUBLIC HEALTH; (III) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (IV) PROMOTING HUMAN RIGHTS IN PARTICULAR BY PROMOTING THE SOUND ENFORCEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION IN INDIVIDUAL CASES; PROMOTING THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; THE RELIEF OF NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; EDUCATION AND RESEARCH; MORAL IMPROVEMENT AND RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES, AND CULTIVATING A PUBLIC SENTIMENT IN FAVOUR OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND (V) ADVANCING SUCH OF THE WORLD'S RELIGIONS AS ARE RECOGNISED AS CHARITABLE UNDER ENGLISH CHARITY LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Stanton Drive
CHICHESTER
West Sussex
West Sussex
PO19 5QN
- Phone:
- 01428
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window