FUTURE STARS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide basketball and other sport related opportunities for underprivileged youth
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Buckinghamshire
- Hertfordshire
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 03 June 2005: Standard registration
- WLBP (Working name)
- HOPE THRU HOOPS (Previous name)
- WEST LONDON BASKETBALL PROJECT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ZBIGNIEW MAJEWSKI | Chair | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Kramer Knutson | Trustee | 30 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Luis Felipe Cristobal Galindo | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Beata Madej | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrii Lebediev | Trustee | 19 May 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £159.60k | £106.20k | £144.25k | £185.36k | £195.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £150.21k | £130.64k | £143.98k | £186.93k | £173.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 July 2021 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 July 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 APR 2005 AS AMENDED ON 14 MAY 2009 AS AMENDED ON 08 AUG 2017
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS BY PROVIDING SPORTING FACILITIES, COACHING FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR PLAYING BASKETBALL AND OTHER SPORT. 2. TO PROVIDE AND ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, SEX, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE AND OF REDUCING SOCIAL EXCLUSION. 3. TO PROVIDE TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES TO SUPPORT YOUNG PEOPLE ACHIEVE A NUMBER OF SPORT AND LEISURE RELATED QUALIFICATIONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
32 Riverside Close
Kingston upon Thames
KT1 2JF
- Phone:
- 07881871251
- Email:
- EVENTS@LONDONUNITED.EU
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window