Trustees NORTHAMPTONSHIRE ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS
Charity number: 1107148

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GEOFF RUSSELL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Thomas Palacio | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Simon Cockayne | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ian Purvis | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Philpott | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liam Fassam | Trustee | 18 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Christopher Hurst | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Rawlings | Trustee | 06 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Geoffrey Keats | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vitor Fernandes-Neto | Trustee | 21 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN CHARLES HARRIS | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
STEVE DAWKS | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.