FRIENDS OF FROXFIELD SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE FUND RAISE TO HELP FROXFIELD COFE PRIMARY SCHOOL. WE HAVE ORGANISED A RANGE OF FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES, FROM HAVING CAKE SALES, SPONSORED WALKS AND ORGANISING PERSONALISED CHRISTMAS PUDDINGS AND TEA TOWELS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Hampshire
Governance
- 09 December 2004: Standard registration
- 09 December 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 August 2018: Re-registered
- FOFS (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sophia Doe | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
katherine Harper | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Innes | Trustee | 14 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Dunford | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.26k | £4.16k | £9.26k | £8.00k | £10.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.19k | £1.61k | £5.87k | £8.00k | £8.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 06 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 04 May 2022 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 15 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 OCTOBER 2004 as amended on 20 Sep 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF FROXFIELD C OF E INFANT SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HIGH CROSS
FROXFIELD
PETERSFIELD
GU32 1EG
- Phone:
- 01730 827251
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window