EMBLETON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY HALL TRUST (CUMBRIA)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO MANAGE AND MAINTAIN EMBLETON AND DISTRICT COMMUNITY HALL
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 20 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERNIE BOARDMAN | Chair |
|
||||||
PETER BERNARD WISEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER WILLIAM HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTINE OSTLE Mrs. | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN EDWARD WILLS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SIMON PAUL DAVIDSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
EDNA HIND | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.40k | £12.38k | £13.64k | £8.50k | £9.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.21k | £6.19k | £8.27k | £18.70k | £14.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £10.64k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 13 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 SEPTEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED 11 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
I. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF PARISH OF EMBLETON, WYTHOP AND SETMURTHY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT') WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, AGE, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. II. TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A PUBLIC HALL (HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE HALL') AND TO MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
EMBLETON, WYTHOP AND SETMURTHY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRACKEN BANK
EMBLETON
COCKERMOUTH
CA13 9XP
- Phone:
- 01768776697
- Email:
- chris.ostle@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window