ALLERTON BYWATER COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotion of public health. Promotion of child care and welfare facilities Promotion of sports and lesiure activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2020
Total income includes £51,009 from 5 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leeds City
Governance
- 06 December 2004: Standard registration
- ABCP (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gurbaksh Kaur Mahey | Chair | 02 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mary Harland | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Julia Almond | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £294.57k | £313.21k | £378.26k | £391.27k | £312.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317.56k | £325.69k | £335.71k | £370.60k | £445.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £49.35k | £0 | N/A | N/A | £51.01k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 FEBRUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION AND OF ECONOMIC, SOCIAL AND ENVIRONMENTAL WELFARE IN AREAS OF ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE PARISH AND/OR VILLAGE OF ALLERTON BYWATER) BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; (B) THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: (B I ) IN SETTING UP THEIR BUSINESS; OR (B II ) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; (C) THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS; (D) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGH FIT INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT; (E) THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES INCLUDING (WITHOUT LIMITATION) THE CLEANING AND REPAIR OF STREETS AND STREET FURNITURE AND ANY COMMUNITY HALL OR OTHER PUBLIC BUILDINGS OR FACILITIES AND THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF PUBLIC OPEN SPACES AND LANDSCAPING; () THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE; (G) THE PROVISION OF ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE AND/OR THOSE WHO BY REASONS OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; (H) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT; (I) THE PROTECTION AND/OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; (J) THE PROVISION OF SUSTAINABLE TRANSPORT MEASURES FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT; (K) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE; (L) THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND (M) SUCH OTHER MEAN AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
PARISH AND/OR VILLAGE OF ALLERTON BYWATER
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE OLD SCHOOL
VICARS TERRACE
ALLERTON BYWATER
CASTLEFORD
WF10 2DJ
- Phone:
- 01977 559 781
- Email:
- abcpozone@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window