ROMSEY OPEN GATE STROKE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a weekly afternoon meeting for social interaction and support with games, tea & chat, entertainment and outings. Several new members this year again.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 February 2005: Standard registration
- THE STROKE CLUB (Working name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christina Keightley | Chair | 03 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Smith | Trustee | 13 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Roger Travers | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN BASFORD | Trustee | 20 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
PHYLLIS BURRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARGARET NIBLETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILL ELIZABETH EDWARDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.55k | £3.51k | £2.69k | £5.62k | £9.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.47k | £1.34k | £4.76k | £7.46k | £7.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED ON 18 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED A STROKE, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE, RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION TO SUCH PERSONS THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BEECHWOOD
SAUNDERS LANE
AWBRIDGE
ROMSEY
SO51 0GP
- Phone:
- 01794340209
- Email:
- jedw43@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window