Financial history ESLINGTON SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1107199
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.07k £3.50k £6.15k £4.61k £5.03k
Total expenditure £3.97k £5.12k £4.07k £5.20k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A