THE FRENCHAY UNIT NEURO CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
By offering a range of recreational activities for our members and their families allows everyone to Exchange ideas Exchange experiences Meet old friends Make new friends Have FUN Many FUN Club members are still going through extensive treatments, often traumatic. The aims above provide all concerned with some brief respite and inject some normality and fun into their lives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 February 2005: Standard registration
- 14 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- 14 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1043603 WALLACE & GROMIT'S CHILDREN'S FOUNDATION
- F.U.N. CLUB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.13k | £5.62k | £650 | £830 | £1.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.23k | £1.26k | £3.36k | £597 | £64 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED ON 3 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE RECEIVED OR WHO ARE RECEIVING TREATMENT FROM THE NEUROSCIENCES TEAM AT FRENCHAY HOSPITAL, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, BY THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES AND ONGOING SUPPORT TO FACILITATE THEIR SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT, TREATMENT OR RECOVERY.
Area of benefit
FRENCHAY HOSPITAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window