SHIPTON BELLINGER COMMUNITY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the Christian faith, hold public services of worship and teaching, and support other local churches and religious activities in the local school. Support community activities and provide pastoral care. Support humanitarian causes and meet social needs directly or through other Christian or secular charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 06 June 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Raymond Searle | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Albert Wilkins | Trustee | 08 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
DAVID GEORGE ENGLISH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DONALD OLDEN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANDREW SULLIVAN | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER PONTING | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GILLIAN GODDARD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.48k | £6.12k | £7.42k | £7.45k | £8.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.10k | £6.37k | £6.05k | £7.05k | £8.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 May 2024 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
(1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO MAKE GRANTS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION ("THE OBJECTS") IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING BELOW:- (A) THE DIVINE INSPIRATION, INFALLIBILITY AND SUPREME AUTHORITY OF THE SCRIPTURES IN ALL MATTERS OF FAITH, CONDUCT AND PRACTICE (B) THE UNITY OF THE FATHER, SON AND HOLY SPIRIT IN THE GODHEAD (C) THE REDEMPTION OF THE INDIVIDUAL FROM THEIR GUILT, PENALTY AND POWER OF SIN ONLY THROUGH THE SACRIFICIAL DEATH OF CHRIST (D) THE BODILY RESURRECTION OF CHRIST FROM THE DEAD (E) SALVATION BY PERSONAL REPENTANCE TOWARDS GOD AND FAITH IN THE LORD JESUS CHRIST (F) THE INDWELLING AND WORK OF THE HOLY SPIRIT IN THE BELIEVER (G) BAPTISM BY TOTAL IMMERSION IN WATER AS AN OUTWARD DECLARATION OF FAITH IN AND OBEDIENCE OF JESUS CHRIST (H) THE CELEBRATION OF COMMUNION (I) THE VISIBLE AND FUTURE PERSONAL RETURN OF JESUS CHRIST. (2) THE PRIMARY AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE SHIPTON BELLINGER IN HAMPSHIRE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA BUT THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO MAKE DONATIONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH CLAUSE D (XIII) ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
MAINLY IN SHIPTON BELLINGER, HAMPSHIRE, BUT THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE TO DONATE ANYWHERE WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
47 ASTOR CRESCENT
LUDGERSHALL
ANDOVER
SP11 9RG
- Phone:
- 01264790285
- Email:
- lesliewilkins80@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window