EAU COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide a village community centre for the village of Scotter and the smaller surrounding villages where all sorts of recreational groups and activities can take place also education and training activities for all age groups. To provide a setting also for other functions like private celebrations and meetings as required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 16 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELEANOR MARJORIE HALLAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rosemarie Jane Russell | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Read | Trustee | 01 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
SusanYvonne Mumby | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET TEMPLEMAN COOPER | Trustee | 01 February 2005 |
|
|||||
Pauline Ann Goodburn | Trustee |
|
||||||
MARTIN LESLIE WINDLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.81k | £4.99k | £6.84k | £22.58k | £9.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.12k | £6.24k | £7.94k | £8.76k | £11.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 August 2024 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 05 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS ADOPTED 2ND NOVEMBER 2004 AMENDED 11TH DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SCOTTER, SCOTTERTHORPE AND SUSWORTH PARISH (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE THE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A MULTI USE CENTRE (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE CENTRE) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR COOPERATION WITH ST PETERS CHURCH SCOTTER, LINCOLNSHIRE LIBRARY SERVICE AND ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSONS OR BODY) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTIVES. C) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
SCOTTER, SCOTTERTHORPE AND SUSWORTH PARISH
Contact information
- Address:
-
36 MILL CRESCENT
SCOTTER
GAINSBOROUGH
DN21 3SE
- Phone:
- 01724764477
- Email:
- jcooper1007@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window