Financial history THE FRIENDS OF CHULMLEIGH PARISH CHURCH

Charity number: 1107279
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £4.12k £2.47k £2.83k £5.02k £4.07k
Total expenditure £66 £837 £336 £5.64k £4.50k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A