Accounts and annual returns CALOW CHILDCARE CO-OPERATIVE LTD

Charity Number: 1108477
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2007 23 March 2009 266 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2006 31 May 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2006 Not Required