CALOW CHILDCARE CO-OPERATIVE LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
cHARITY NO LONGER ACTIVE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 08 March 2005: Standard registration
- 23 July 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CALOW KIDS CLUB (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.08k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.90k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 23 March 2009 | 266 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | 31 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 JANUARY 2005.
Charitable objects
(1) TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS. (2) TO PROVIDE NECESSARY FACILITIES FOR DAILY CARE, RECREATION AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN DURING OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND SCHOOL HOLIDAYS. (3) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PERSONS IN THE PROVISION OF SUCH CARE, RECREATIONAL AND EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, CALOW, CHESTERFIELD, DERBYSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window