L&NWR SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in all aspects of the London & North Western Railway, including the study and preservation of information, drawings, photographs, models and other material pertaining to the railway company and related organisations and subjects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £4,437 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 June 2005: Standard registration
- 01 August 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 01 August 2024: Funds transferred to 1204954 L&NWR SOCIETY
- LNWR SOCIETY (Working name)
- LNWRS (Working name)
- LONDON & NORTH WESTERN RAILWAY SOCIETY (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.31k | £35.88k | £35.69k | £45.28k | £46.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.91k | £35.69k | £32.38k | £42.82k | £42.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.49k | £112 | N/A | N/A | £4.44k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 MAY 2004 AS AMENDED 21 MAY 2005. AS AMENDED ON 26/05/2012 as amended on 09 Jun 2018 as amended on 08 Jun 2019 as amended on 24 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE LONDON AND NORTH WESTERN RAILWAY , INCLUDING THE STUDY AND PRESERVATION OF INFORMATION, DRAWINGS, PHOTOGRAPHS, MODELS AND OTHER MATERIAL PERTAINING TO THE RAILWAY COMPANY AND RELATED ORGANISATIONS AND SUBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window