THE VILLAGE ALIVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST AND COMMUNITY REGENERATION GROUP
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 10 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA JANE GRIFFITHS | Chair | 31 October 2014 |
|
|||||
Michael Arthur Powell | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|||||
Pamela Mary Watkins | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Morgan-Jones | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR KENNETH PRANDY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID WYN BINDING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £450 | £1.57k | £4.03k | £2.44k | £12.47k | |
|
Total expenditure | £274 | £302 | £2.05k | £50 | £875 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JUNE 2004 as amended on 11 May 2022 as amended on 18 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
The objects of the charity are to preserve for the benefit of the people of Monmouthshire and of the Nation, the historical, architectural and constructional heritage that may exist in and around Monmouthshire in buildings (including any structure or erection, and any part of a building as so defined and its historic setting) of particular beauty or historical, architectural or constructional interest and to advance public education and interest in the history of the area
Area of benefit
MONMOUTHSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Newhouse
Cefn Llytha
Llangattock Lingoed
ABERGAVENNY
Gwent
NP7 8NT
- Phone:
- 01873821418
- Email:
- village.alive@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window