THE RAF BIRCHAM NEWTON MEMORIAL PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of memorials and conservation of historical records
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 September 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jamie Heffer | Chair | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David John White | Trustee | 08 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Pauline Ann Fisher | Trustee | 13 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £981 | £259 | £1.41k | £928 | £2.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £739 | £503 | £1.26k | £1.53k | £1.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 March 2024 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 6 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY OF ROYAL AIR FORCE BIRCHAM NEWTON, NORFOLK, AND ITS SATELLITE AIRFIELDS AT DOCKING AND LANGHAM, BY THE PROVISION AND UPKEEP OF MEMORIALS COMMEMORATING THE HISTORY OF THE SITES AND THOSE WHO SERVED THERE. 2. THE FURTHER INFORMATION OF THE PUBLIC AND NATIONAL CONSTRUCTION COLLEGE PERSONNEL AND VISITORS IN THE HISTORY OF ROYAL AIR FORCE BIRCHAM NEWTON AND ITS SATELLITE AIRFIELDS, THROUGH THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A HERITAGE ROOM.
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Bishops Road
Gaywood
KING'S LYNN
Norfolk
PE30 4NS
- Phone:
- 07807098348
- Email:
- jamie_heffer@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window