ALL SAINTS SPORTS EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL COMPANY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities involves the promotion of pupil and community participation in sport, physical activity and healthy recreation by providing facilities for the playing of football, basketball, volleyball, netball and other sports. In addition it provides facilities for educational and leisure activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sean Patrick Pender | Trustee | 13 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BERNARD SAWYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PAUL BERNARD DOHERTY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DIXON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOSEPH GEORGE MCNALLY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.65k | £153.35k | £132.84k | £168.61k | £225.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £145.35k | £149.67k | £113.87k | £168.41k | £209.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 06 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 12 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHEFFIELD WITHOUT THE DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION OR RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITY, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS OF SHEFFIELD AND THE PUPILS AND STAFF OF ALL SAINTS CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOL IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING EDUCATIONAL ACHIEVEMENT AND THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS CATHOLIC HIGH SCHOOL
GRANVILLE ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S2 2RJ
- Phone:
- 01142724851
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window