ACCESSIBLE FRIENDS NETWORK (TAFN)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Accessible Friends Network (TAFN) provides support, training and social activities run by and for blind and visually impaired people, via the internet and VoIP conferencing.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Australia
- Netherlands
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 11 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roann Clarke | Chair | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julie Hansen | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Greg Hamilton | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Tyler | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
John Wells | Trustee | 01 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.30k | £3.10k | £4.42k | £4.03k | £1.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.21k | £4.29k | £3.87k | £3.01k | £2.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 15 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 11 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 26 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/11/2004 AS AMENDED ON 13/01/2005 AS AMENDED ON 19/02/2006 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2009 AS AMENDED ON 13/12/2009 AS AMENDED ON 12/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 15/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE BLIND OR PARTIALLY SIGHTED BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE, INFORMATION, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM NECESSARY, WITH A VIEW TO ASSISTING SUCH PERSONS TO DEVELOP THEIR POTENTIAL AND THEREFORE IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
11777, P.O.Box 7169
POOLE
DORSET
BH15 9EL
- Phone:
- 0203 2909254
- Email:
- info@tafn.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window