HUTTOFT VILLAGE HALL COMMITTEE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
this is a hall for anyone to hire for their social occassions
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lincolnshire
Governance
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER MEAKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Barbara Sykes | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Christen | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET BROWN | Trustee | 13 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
WENDY ANN MEAKER | Trustee | 14 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.03k | £25.20k | £23.96k | £4.76k | £4.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.55k | £26.95k | £11.81k | £8.44k | £6.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £19.00k | £300 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 17 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 05 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 01 DEC 2014 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 04 DEC 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HUTTOFT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY OF MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HUTTOFT
Contact information
- Address:
-
OLCOTE FARM
SEA LANE
HUTTOFT
ALFORD
LN13 9RN
- Phone:
- 01507490238
- Email:
- olcotefarm@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window