Financial history THE COMMUNITY CHURCH IN THE NORTH WEST OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 1107226
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £460.54k £362.15k £303.36k £287.87k £257.62k
Total expenditure £261.65k £291.47k £286.51k £281.56k £284.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A