BUDLEIGH MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote musical festivals and music-related activities in the area of East Devon and particularly in Budleigh Salterton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 26 January 2005: Standard registration
- BSFT (Working name)
- BUDLEIGH SALTERTON FESTIVAL (Previous name)
- BUDLEIGH SALTERTON FESTIVAL LTD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Catherine Mary Turner - known as Kate Somerby | Chair | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
JAMES OLIVER ALPE | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr HOWELL MARTYN EVANS | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Janet Keliher | Trustee | 07 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Madeleine Heather Collie | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.65k | £73.12k | £82.74k | £127.94k | £118.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.03k | £72.86k | £89.73k | £107.86k | £122.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | £1.00k | £16.50k | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 22 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | 03 May 2021 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 26 JAN 2024 as amended on 09 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS INCLUDING MUSIC, ART AND DRAMA BY THE PROVISION OF THE BUDLEIGH SALTERTON FESTIVAL AND SUCH OTHER FESTIVALS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
BUDLEIGH SALTERTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Homestone House
Fore Street
Otterton
BUDLEIGH SALTERTON
Devon
EX9 7HB
- Phone:
- 01392876010
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window