COPPICEWOOD COLLEGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We teach Coppicing, Traditional Hedgelaying, Green Woodworking, Care and Maintenance of Hand Tools, Willow Weaving, Care and Awareness of the Environment. Woodland management using traditional skills Our age group is 18 years and over. We have an equal opportunities policy and offer opportunities to all sectors of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 14 December 2004: Standard registration
- COPPICEWOOD COLLEGE (Working name)
- DEASSARTATION SCHOOL OF TRADITIONAL RURAL SKILLS (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nathan William Walton | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Wigney | Trustee | 05 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Holly Harries | Trustee | 05 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew James Bowering | Trustee | 03 May 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.10k | £47.03k | £17.49k | £19.74k | £9.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.36k | £37.10k | £18.33k | £18.09k | £14.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £23.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 07 February 2025 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 02 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 17 May 2022 | 101 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 08 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27 NOVEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED 20 APRIL 2008.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING BY DEVELOPING AND DELIVERING A RANGE OF EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES, COURSES AND PROGRAMMES IN TRADITIONAL RURAL SKILLS AND ALLIED CRAFTS AND GLOBAL ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES FOR THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF CARMARTHENSHIRE, CEREDIGION, PEMBROKESHIRE AND ALL WALES. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP TO THOSE WHO THROUGH SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES ARE IN NEED AND ARE UNABLE TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT BY PROMOTING AND SUPPORTING SCHEMES WHERE SUCH PEOPLE MAY RECEIVE TRAINING FOR EMPLOYMENT IN RURAL LAND BASED INDUSTRIES.
Area of benefit
CARMARTHENSHIRE, CEREDIGION, PEMBROKESHIRE AND ALL WALES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o The Welsh Wildlife Centre
Cwmplysgog
Cilgerran
CARDIGAN
Dyfed
SA43 2TB
- Phone:
- 07749565321
- Website:
-
coppicewoodcollege.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window