KULAN SOMALI ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Based in Westminster. Aim to improve the lives of the Somali community in London. Activities include:information and advice service, employment support project NEET categorized individuals, supporting Somali prisoners well being and employment prospects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 12 April 2005: Standard registration
- KULAN SOMALI ORGANISATION (Working name)
- KULAN (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Roda Jama Warsama Saeed | Chair | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mohamed Ibrahim Yousuf | Trustee | 02 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Awrala Mumin Sheikh | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £976 | £7.60k | £79.89k | £199.93k | £123.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £976 | £7.60k | £47.75k | £144.10k | £95.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £176.43k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 March 2024 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 March 2024 | 38 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22/07/2002 AS AMENDED ON 19/03/2005 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/2011
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS OF SOMALI COMMUNITY IN WESTMINSTER ARE OF LONDON BY PROVISION OF ADVICE ON ISSUES OF WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, EMPLOYMENT, HEALTH AND ADVOCACY. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES BY FACILITA0TING THE PROVISION OF ACCESS TO LANGUAGE CLASSES AND OTHER FORMS OF TRAINING AND EDUCATION INCLUDING THE CULTURE AND HISTORY OF SOMALIA. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE SOMALI COMMUNITY BY THE PROVISION OF ADVICE AND HEALTH WORKSHOPS. THE PROVISION FACILITIES AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE SAID COMMUNITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ONE WESTMINSTER
WEST END HOUSE
37 CHAPEL STREET
LONDON
NW1 5DP
- Phone:
- 07956882066
- Email:
- Rhoda@kulankso.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window