THE MIHAI EMINESCU TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the Charity is the promotion of education, culture, religion and academic research within Romania. It is non-political and supports every kind of educational behaviour. The principal activity of the charity is the giving of grants (financial, educational, material, promotional) to individuals and organisations in Romania
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Romania
Governance
- 16 December 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JESSICA VIOLET DOUGLAS-HOME | Chair |
|
||||||
Jeremy Christopher Peter Amos | Trustee | 09 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR NOEL ROBERT MALCOLM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY WALSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.87k | £3.44k | £2.57k | £5.92k | £1.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.65k | £55.27k | £101.29k | £204.69k | £62.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 August 2024 | 114 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 24 March 2023 | 328 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 03 May 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 OCTOBER 2003.
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING AMONG INHABITANTS OF ROMANIA; (II) THE ADVANCEMENT AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE CONSERVATION OF ROMANIA'S BUILT AND NATURAL HERITAGE; (III) SUCH OTHER OBJECTS OR PURPOSES ( WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE) BEING CHARITABLE OBJECTS OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
ROMANIA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 CLARENDON ROAD
LONDON
W11 4JB
- Phone:
- 02072297618
- Email:
- admin@mihaieminescutrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window