Financial history REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD HOLY GHOST ZONE (NORTHAMPTON)

Charity number: 1107278
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £102.05k £93.78k £96.52k £126.89k £161.95k
Total expenditure £87.88k £71.97k £165.08k £161.87k £159.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A