Trustees THE FRIENDS OF PRIORY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION FOPSA
Charity number: 1107280

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karolina Slade | Chair | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Louise Warrender | Trustee | 02 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Florita Daniells | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Morley | Trustee | 16 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Janine Williams | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Hage | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tina French | Trustee | 24 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elodie Sellier | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.