ROCHDALE INTER AGENCY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE FORUM
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rochdale Interagency Domestic violence forum provide an outreach service to women and their children experiencing domestic abuse. The Forum also provide multi-agency training on a quarterly basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rochdale
Governance
- 03 March 2005: Standard registration
- 12 December 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- RIADVF (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.96k | £134.60k | £191.41k | £194.65k | £260.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.71k | £128.14k | £170.78k | £193.51k | £249.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 10 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 28 March 2011 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 11 October 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 09 March 2010 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 26 February 2010 | 26 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 NOVEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
TO ENABLE AGENCIES IN ROCHDALE AND ITS ENVIRONS TO PROVIDE A CO-ORDINATED AND COLLABORATIVE APPROACH TO DOMESTIC VIOLENCE IN ALL ITS FORMS BY: A) PROMOTING FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THE PROVISION OF SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND THE RELIEF AND SUPPORT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED OR ARE IN DANGER OF SUFFERING VIOLENCE FROM PERPETRATORS KNOWN TO THEM. B) ADVANCING THE EDUCATION OF VOLUNTARY AND STATUTORY AGENCIES AND THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF DOMESTIC VIOLENCE, ITS CAUSES AND PREVENTION.
Area of benefit
ROCHDALE AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window