Financial history THE INDIAN GYMKHANA CLUB TRUST 2004

Charity number: 1107282
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £36.95k £52.84k £12.41k £15.03k £65.59k
Total expenditure £36.77k £54.56k £18.67k £16.95k £34.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 N/A
Income from government grants £25.00k £36.18k N/A N/A N/A